THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 5:50:00 AM
Uddin, Sameena
CPSO#:
79004
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Hindi, Urdu
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Peel Regional Cancer Centre
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 1841
Fax: (905) 813-4024
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:16 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Thoracic Surgery |
Effective:06 Oct 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SAMEENA UDDIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UDDIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Thoracic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 7 - Thoracic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 May 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2009 |