THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 3:08:25 AM
Hawisa, Nura Ibrahim Sheibani
CPSO#:
78991
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Aug 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Aug 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
170 Rockhaven Lane
Hamilton ON L0R 2H6
Phone: 9056899499
Fax: 9056895284
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:14 Nov 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NURA IBRAHIM SHEIBANI HAWISA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAWISA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 May 2003 to 26 Jun 2003
PEAP - R - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 27 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 15 Nov 2009 to 14 Nov 2010
CF - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 May 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Nov 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 May 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Aug 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2011 |