THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 4:50:17 AM
Garbharran, Hari Narain
CPSO#:
78987
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
07 Jul 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
15 May 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: University of Natal, 1979
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Hari N. Garbharran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 30 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:44 Castlemore Avenue, Markham, ON L6L 2G2
Date Received: 01 Jun 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:19 Nov 1993 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 May 2003 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 07 Jul 2015 |