THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 19:46:33 PM
Barchan, Olexander
CPSO#:
78958
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Apr 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Apr 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Russian, Ukrainian
Education: National Medical University, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
300 Pinellas Street
Clearwater ON 33756
United States
Phone: 8082060755
Electoral District: 01
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Barchan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 20 2009
Corporation Name: Barchan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California
USA - Hawaii
USA - North Carolina
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. OLEXANDER BARCHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BARCHAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Apr 2003 |