THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 2:54:17 AM
Mohammad, Waleed M M A
CPSO#:
78953
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 May 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Sep 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Armed Forces Hospital Kuwait
Sabhan 35852
Kuwait
Phone: 96522571636
Fax: 96522571838
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Kuwait
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. WALEED M M A MOHAMMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMMAD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PEAP - R - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - General Surgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Sep 2009 |