THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 12:42:18 PM
El-Keeb, Rabea AbdulMonaim Hasen
CPSO#:
78945
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Tripoli Faculty of Medicin, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-4996
Fax: (905) 721-6673
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site |
Ajax |
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site |
Oshawa |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:08 Sep 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RABEA ABDULMONAIM HASEN EL-KEEB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-KEEB is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 16 Apr 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 21 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 26 Sep 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respirology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respirology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 2008 |