THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 19:32:29 PM
Tharson, Carolyn Cherubini
CPSO#:
78938
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Aug 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Albany Medical College of Union Univ, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
570 Lacolle Way
Ottawa ON K4A 0N9
Phone: 613-699-3376
Fax: 613-841-6770
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CAROLYN CHERUBINI THARSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THARSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 14 Apr 2003 to 11 May 2003
EL - Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 May 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Jan 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Aug 2006 |