THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:04:55 PM
Shiffman, Howard Neil
CPSO#:
78936
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Jan 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jan 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
A2-2 Champagne Dr
Polyclinic Family and Specialty Med
North York ON M3J 0K2
Phone: 416-222-6160
Fax: 416-222-9604
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:03 Dec 2003 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HOWARD NEIL SHIFFMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIFFMAN is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 2003 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Apr 2003 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 13 Apr 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Jun 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jan 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jan 2004 |