THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:33:57 PM
D'Cunha Rebello, Chrysal Dorothy Emiliana
CPSO#:
78929
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Sep 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
D'Cunha, Chrysal Dorothy Emiliana (used until: 28 Sep 2006 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi
Education: Ross University School of Medicine, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
205 Markham Road
Scarborough ON M1J 3C3
Phone: (416) 265-6663
Fax: (416) 265-1263
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:08 Jun 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRYSAL DOROTHY EMILIANA D'CUNHA REBELLO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. D'CUNHA REBELLO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 07 Apr 2003 to 04 May 2003
EL - Paediatric Nephrology
University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2003 to 14 Dec 2003
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism
University of Toronto, 05 Apr 2004 to 25 Apr 2004
EL - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 15 Nov 2004 to 12 Dec 2004
EL - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 04 May 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Dec 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Apr 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 Apr 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Dec 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2006 |