THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 3:01:32 AM
Popuri, Padma
CPSO#:
78917
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Apr 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
08 Apr 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Puranam, Padma (used until: 09 Dec 2010 )
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Sri Venkatesvara University, 1982
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health sciences north
Sudbury ON P3E 5J1
Phone: (705) 523-7147
Fax: (705) 671-7392
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PADMA POPURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. POPURI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2003 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Apr 2003 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 07 Nov 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 15 Nov 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Apr 2008 |