THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 5:18:59 AM
Muhsen, Jafaar
CPSO#:
78916
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Apr 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Apr 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Baghdad College of Medicin, 1989
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Walk-in Clinic
500 Centennial Parkway
Stoney Creek ON L8E 0G2
Phone: (905) 594-1828
Fax: (905)594-1829
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:02 Dec 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAFAAR MUHSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUHSEN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Apr 2003 |