THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 9:42:22 AM
Haq, Iftikhar Ul
CPSO#:
78911
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Aug 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: Nishtar Medical College, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medical center
suite102-984 oliver road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 7C7
Phone: (807) 766-3590
Fax: (807) 766-3586
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:27 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IFTIKHAR UL HAQ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAQ is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2003 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Mar 2003 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 30 Mar 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 20 Jan 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Aug 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Aug 2007 |