THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 5:45:27 AM
Porwal, Hemraj Ratanchand
CPSO#:
78899
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Mar 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Mar 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi
Education: Karnatak University Dharwar, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
6400 Valley Way
Niagara Falls ON L2E 7E3
Phone: 905-358-3277
Fax: 905-358-3012
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound |
Owen Sound |
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site |
Fort Erie |
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site |
Port Colborne |
Niagara Health System - Welland Site |
Welland |
Niagara Health System |
Niagara Falls |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:02 Dec 2002 |
CFPC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:10 May 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. HEMRAJ RATANCHAND PORWAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PORWAL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 2003 |