THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 20:11:25 PM
Dorah, Nicholas Hugh
CPSO#:
78872
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit E
318 Ontario Street
St Catharines ON L2R 5L8
Phone: (905) 704-1281
Fax: (905) 704-1642
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site |
St Catharines |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:01 Jan 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NICHOLAS HUGH DORAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DORAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2003 to 23 May 2003
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 24 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Sep 2003
CF - Paediatric Infectious Diseases
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
International Specialist Physician - Pediatrics
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 10 May 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Sep 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Feb 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |