THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 9:42:51 AM
Robes, Reynaldo Perez
CPSO#:
78869
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jun 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jun 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tagalog
Education: Universit of The City of Manila, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
105-778 Sheppard Ave W
North York ON M3H 6B7
Phone: 6473526188
Fax: 6473529288
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:05 May 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. REYNALDO PEREZ ROBES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBES is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Feb 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 29 Feb 2004
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 27 Feb 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Feb 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 2006 |