THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 14:37:56 PM
Aswald, Jorg Michael
CPSO#:
78866
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Feb 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, German
Education: Wilhelms Westphalian Univ at Munster, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Unit 210
460 Springbank Drive
London ON N6J 0A8
Phone: (519) 641-2102
Fax: (519) 641-2103
Electoral District: 02
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Germany
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Baycrest Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JORG MICHAEL ASWALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASWALD is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 10 Feb 2003 to 05 May 2003
PEAP - CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 06 May 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Hematology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 08 Aug 2004
CF - Hematology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 09 Aug 2004 to 31 Oct 2004
AVP - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2004 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 Feb 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 May 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 09 Aug 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2004 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2007 |