THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 23:39:37 PM
Shenderey, Alexander Isaakovitch
CPSO#:
78848
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Oct 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
12 Oct 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew, Russian
Education: Leningrad Paediatric Medical Institute, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital |
Brampton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Aug 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ALEXANDER ISAAKOVITCH SHENDEREY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHENDEREY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 28 Mar 2003
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 29 Mar 2003 to 29 Feb 2004
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 07 Feb 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 2010 |