THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 17:53:34 PM
van Rensburg, Adriaan Esias
CPSO#:
78817
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Jul 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jul 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Stellenbosch, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
200 Elizabeth Street EN 3 464
Toronto ON M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 715-7595
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site |
Toronto |
Kensington Eye Institute |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site |
Toronto |
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:31 May 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADRIAAN ESIAS VAN RENSBURG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN RENSBURG is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 28 Mar 2003
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 29 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Sep 2004
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 27 Jan 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Mar 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Sep 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jul 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jul 2008 |