THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 11:01:54 AM
Jayaraman, Jai
CPSO#:
78814
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Aug 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Nov 2022
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Tamil
Education: Cornell University, 2001
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Humber River Regional Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
Toronto ON M3M 0B2
Phone: 4162421000
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Jai Jayaraman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 4 2019
Hospital Privileges
Hospital Notices
Source: Hospital
Active Date: July 5, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
On July 5, 2018, Humber River Hospital (HRH) notified the College that Dr. Jayaraman did not submit an Application for Reappointment for the 2018-2019 reappointment year and consequently his privileges terminated.
Dr. Jayaraman’s privileges at HRH were reinstated in 2020.
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JAI JAYARAMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAYARAMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 02 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 22 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 23 Jan 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Jan 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Aug 2005 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 11 Aug 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 18 Aug 2006 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 15 Nov 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 24 Mar 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 01 May 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by member |
Effective: 21 Jun 2021 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2022 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: January 11, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: March 14, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:
Download Full Document (PDF)