THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 0:43:21 AM
McNally, Linda June
CPSO#:
78806
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
14 Aug 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
21 Jan 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: L J McNally Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 9 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:07 Dec 2000 |
CFPC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jan 2003 |
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee |
Effective: 09 Nov 2006 |
Suspension of registration removed |
Effective: 09 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 14 Aug 2019 |
Previous Hearings
Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 09 Nov 2006
Summary:
On November 9, 2006, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario found that Dr. Linda June McNally committed professional misconduct in that she has engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.
1. The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. McNally(s certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, three (3) months of which shall be suspended if Dr. McNally successfully completes, at her own expense, the College(s Boundaries Course on the next available date and the College(s Medical Ethics Course by May 9, 2007, and provides proof thereof to the College. The commencement date for the suspension is November 9, 2006.
2. The Discipline Committee directs Dr. McNally to appear before the panel to be reprimanded.
3. The Discipline Committee orders Dr. McNally to pay to the College costs in the amount of $2,500.00 within ninety (90) days of the date of this Order.
4. The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in the register.
Therefore, the certificate of registration in the Province of Ontario issued in the name of Dr. Linda June McNally is suspended effective November 9, 2006 at 11:59 p.m.
Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Nov 09, 2006
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: May 3, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)