THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 9:54:56 AM
Hanmiah, Rajendar
CPSO#:
78798
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Dec 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Dec 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Room F533
Fontbone Building
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 521-6146
Fax: (905) 521-6068
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 1997 |
RCPSC Specialist |
General Internal Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RAJENDAR HANMIAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HANMIAH is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2003 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 04 Aug 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2004 |