THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 5:42:16 AM
Fatima, Syeda
CPSO#:
78796
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 May 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 May 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, Hindi, Telugu, Urdu
Education: Sri Venkatesvara University, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
835 King St W
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 742-3611
Fax: (519) 744-1168
Electoral District: 03
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Syeda Fatima Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 29 2023
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:31 Dec 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SYEDA FATIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FATIMA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Nov 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 01 Jun 2004
CF - Internal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jan 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Jun 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 May 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 May 2007 |