THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 15:53:10 PM
Mackay, Helen Jane
CPSO#:
78783
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
13 Sep 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
13 Sep 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Edinburgh, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Odette Cancer Centre
Sunnybrook Heath Sciences Centre
Suite T2-023
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416 480 5145
Fax: 416 480 6002
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:13 Sep 2005 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 14 Feb 2003
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 15 Feb 2003 to 11 Oct 2003
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Mar 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Oct 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 May 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
|
Active |