THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 23:51:14 PM
Mohamed, Roubiya Sameem
CPSO#:
78767
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jan 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Dec 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Sinhala, Tamil
Education: University of Jaffna, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Clinicare Medical Centre
Suite 106
2855 Markham Rd
Scarborough ON M1X 0C3
Phone: (416) 293-5454
Fax: (416) 293-7454
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:17 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROUBIYA SAMEEM MOHAMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAMED is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 Jan 2003 to 05 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 Jan 2004 to 05 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 2004 |