THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 13:03:48 PM
Pawelec - Brzychczy, Anna
CPSO#:
78766
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jan 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Jan 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Polish
Education: Academy of Medicine, Wroclaw, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
60 Chesley Avenue
London ON N5Z 2C1
Phone: (519) 433-8424
Fax: (519) 433-5796
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANNA PAWELEC - BRZYCHCZY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAWELEC - BRZYCHCZY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 Jan 2003 to 05 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 Jan 2004 to 05 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 Jan 2005 to 13 Feb 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Jan 2005 |