THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 23:18:54 PM
Olah, Marketa
CPSO#:
78764
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Jul 2005
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
15 Jul 2005
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Charles Univ Prague Fac General Medicine, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3826 Bloor ST W
Etobicoke ON M9B 1K8
Phone: (416) 231-2233
Fax: (416) 231-2234
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 2005 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARKETA OLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLAH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 Jan 2003 to 05 Jan 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 Jan 2004 to 05 Jan 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 06 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 15 Jul 2005 |