THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 10:11:32 AM
Tansey, Patrick Alfred Harbison
CPSO#:
78758
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 170
4600 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON L4L 4Y7
Phone: (416) 746-1818
Fax: (416) 746-1815
Electoral District: 05
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:04 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PATRICK ALFRED HARBISON TANSEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TANSEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 02 Feb 2003
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 03 Feb 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 13 Feb 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Feb 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2009 |
Concerns
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: January 8, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Note: Effective August 18, 2021, Dr. Tansey has completed the required elements of his SCERP.
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review.
Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)