THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 18:53:44 PM
Najm-Tehrani, Nasrin
CPSO#:
78755
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
18 Apr 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
18 Apr 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: University of Wales, 1987
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick Children
Department of Ophthalmology
and Vision Sciences
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-8919
Electoral District: 10
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. N. Najm-Tehrani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 24 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:27 May 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 31 Mar 2003
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2004 to 30 Nov 2004
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Apr 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Dec 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Apr 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 18 Apr 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 18 Apr 2012 |
|
Active |