THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 8:21:14 AM
Smith, Kirsten Leigh
CPSO#:
78752
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jun 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Suite 315
1333 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON M2J 1V1
Phone: (416) 494-0007
Fax: (416) 494-8758
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:16 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KIRSTEN LEIGH SMITH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SMITH is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 07 Jan 2003 to 02 Feb 2003
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 03 Feb 2003 to 28 Feb 2003
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2003 to 28 Mar 2003
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Mar 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jun 2004 |