THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 4:50:53 AM
Bucur, Mirela Silvia Maria
CPSO#:
78734
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Mar 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Mar 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French, Romanian
Education: University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1983
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
206A-525 Belmont Ave W
Kitchener ON N2M 5E2
Phone: 519-954-2201
Fax: 519-954-2202
Electoral District: 03
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Mar 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MIRELA SILVIA MARIA BUCUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BUCUR is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
International Specialist Physician - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Dec 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Mar 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Mar 2011 |