THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 8:54:13 AM
Bhagavatula, Subramanya Sastry
CPSO#:
78733
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Apr 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
23 Apr 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Telugu, Urdu
Education: University of Delhi, 1986
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
Department of Psychiatry
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON P3E 1X3
Phone: (705) 675-5900 Ext. 8234
Fax: (705) 671-3031
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:15 Oct 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SUBRAMANYA SASTRY BHAGAVATULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BHAGAVATULA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 31 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
International Specialist Physician - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 13 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 14 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Dec 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Apr 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 23 Apr 2009 |