THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 10:12:12 AM
Pandit, Rajani Venkatesh
CPSO#:
78727
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
03 May 2023
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Tamil, Telugu
Education: Sri Venkatesvara University, 1985
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1485 Walbrook Dr
San Jose CA 95129-4149
United States
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Rajani Pandit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 24 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:01 Jan 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 30 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
International Specialist Physician - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Dec 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 14 Aug 2003 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jan 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Feb 2007 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 16 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 03 May 2023 |