THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
01/05/24 9:37:22 AM
Iordanov, Kolio Iordanov
CPSO#:
78724
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
31 Aug 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
24 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bulgarian, English, German, Russian
Education: Medical Academy Sofia, 1975
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Iordanov Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 24 2020
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:QHC Trenton Memorial Hospital
242 King St, Trenton, ON K8V 5S6
Date Received: 31 Aug 2020
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Apr 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 13 Mar 2003
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 14 Mar 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 20 Sep 2004
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 21 Sep 2004 to 16 Jan 2005
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology
University of Ottawa, 17 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Mar 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Sep 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jan 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Jan 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Aug 2006 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 29 Aug 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 31 Aug 2020 |