THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 5:42:09 AM
Li, Christopher Kevin
CPSO#:
78720
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2003
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Cantonese, English
Education: University of Calgary, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Respirology Room 6-045
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-6026
Fax: (416) 864-5649
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
St Michael's Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:30 Jun 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Respirology |
Effective:16 Sep 2003 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER KEVIN LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Dec 2002 to 12 Jan 2003
EL - Respiratory Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Jan 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2003 |