THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 8:31:50 AM
Gilani, Sadia A
CPSO#:
78712
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of the Punjab, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
668 Concession Street
Hamilton ON L8V 4T9
Phone: (905) 538-4146
Fax: (905) 538-4147
Electoral District: 04
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:29 Apr 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SADIA A GILANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 16 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Dec 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 11 Nov 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 2008 |