THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 8:41:59 AM
Dhamanaskar, Prashant Kamalakar
CPSO#:
78711
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
12 Sep 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
12 Sep 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Dhamanskar, Prashant Kamalakar (used until: 17 Dec 2002 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Marathi
Education: University of Pune, 1991
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Department Of Pathology
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 5644
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre |
Toronto |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:01 Apr 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 30 Dec 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
International Specialist Physician - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 01 Sep 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 02 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 01 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 30 Dec 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 2007 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 26 Feb 2009 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Feb 2009 |
|
Active |