THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
05/05/24 16:29:11 PM
Flament, Martine France Claude
CPSO#:
78704
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
04 Dec 2002
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: University of Paris, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Flament Bisserbe Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 20 2015
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
The Royal Ottawa Hospital
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa, ON K1Z 7K4
Date Received: 23 Apr 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Sep 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 2002 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 09 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2015 |