THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 22:44:28 PM
Hategan, Ana
CPSO#:
78695
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1995
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
88 Maplewood Ave
St Peter's Hospital - HHS
Hamilton ON L8M 1W9
Phone: (905) 549-6525 Ext. 12360
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Centre for Mountain Health Services |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jan 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ANA HATEGAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HATEGAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 02 Dec 2002 to 02 Jun 2003
International Specialist Physician - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 03 Jun 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Jul 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Dec 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |