THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 18:06:56 PM
Saha, Tarit Kanti
CPSO#:
78692
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
03 Dec 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
03 Dec 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Bengali, English, Hindi
Education: Rajasthan University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesiology
Kingston Health Sciences Center
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 7827
Electoral District: 06
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
New Brunswick
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:17 Jun 2010 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TARIT KANTI SAHA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SAHA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Dec 2002 to 31 Dec 2002
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 06 Jan 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Dec 2004
CF - Anesthesiology
Queen's University, 01 Jan 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Dec 2002 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Dec 2002 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Jan 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jul 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Dec 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 03 Dec 2010 |