THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 20:18:53 PM
Krishna, Popuri Murali
CPSO#:
78690
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
07 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Telugu
Education: Kurnool Medical College, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON P3E 1X3
Phone: (705) 675-5900 Ext. 8234
Fax: (705) 671-3031
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:28 Apr 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Geriatric Psychiatry |
Effective:23 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. POPURI MURALI KRISHNA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KRISHNA is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2002 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Nov 2002 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 07 Nov 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Feb 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 02 Apr 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Mar 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 07 Mar 2008 |