THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 11:49:19 AM
Manji, Shelina Shelina
CPSO#:
78684
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McMaster University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. S. Manji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 1 2022
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Patients may request a copy of their medical records by sending an email to [email protected].
Date Received: 12 Oct 2022
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:10 May 2002 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHELINA SHELINA MANJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANJI is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Nov 2002 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 03 Aug 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Aug 2017 |