THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 3:30:24 AM
Dhir, Achal Kumar
CPSO#:
78676
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
11 Feb 2010
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
11 Feb 2010
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: L L R M Medical College, Meerut Univ, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Campus Site
Department of Anaesthesia
and Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road P O Box 5339
London ON N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3022
Electoral District: 02
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
London Health Sciences Centre |
London |
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital |
London |
St Joseph's Health Care, London |
London |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:23 Oct 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Sep 2003
CF - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Oct 2003 to 16 Jan 2004
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Jan 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 17 Jan 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 May 2008 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 12 May 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Feb 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Feb 2024 |
|
Active |