THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:48:02 AM
Furtado, Richard Joseph
CPSO#:
78672
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
22 Jun 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Jun 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
587 River road West
Unit #6
Wasaga Beach ON L9Z 2P2
Phone: 705-220-1710
Fax: 705-717-7560
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital |
Collingwood |
Georgian Bay General Hospital |
Midland |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RICHARD JOSEPH FURTADO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FURTADO is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 18 Nov 2002 to 18 Dec 2002
EL - Anesthesiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 28 Jul 2003 to 24 Aug 2003
EL - Family Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 17 Nov 2003 to 14 Dec 2003
EL - Diagnostic Radiology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 13 Aug 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 12 Aug 2006
CF - Family Medicine (Anaesthesia)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 18 Nov 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 18 Dec 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 24 Aug 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Nov 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 14 Dec 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 10 Mar 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Apr 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Jun 2004 |