THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 6:12:44 AM
McKinney, Kevin Geruard
CPSO#:
78659
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
28 Mar 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
28 Mar 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the West Indies, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
40 Westmore, Suite 101A
Etobicoke ON M9V 4C2
Phone: (416) 744-2221
Fax: (416) 745-2225
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Bahamas
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:08 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEVIN GERUARD MCKINNEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MCKINNEY is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 05 Nov 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 06 Nov 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 27 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Nov 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 27 Oct 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Mar 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Mar 2012 |