THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 12:09:30 PM
Andrawis, Mamdouh Nabil Riad
CPSO#:
78653
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
25 Jun 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Jun 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English, French
Education: Alexandria University Faculty of Medicin, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
220 Main Street
Unit 4
Bath ON K0H 1G0
Phone: 613-354-3960
Fax: 613-354-8077
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital |
Napanee |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:16 Dec 2004 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAMDOUH NABIL RIAD ANDRAWIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ANDRAWIS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Queen's University, 01 Sep 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Oct 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Nov 2003 to 31 Oct 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Queen's University, 01 Nov 2004 to 30 Nov 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Nov 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Jun 2007 |