THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 9:36:24 AM
Martin, Douglas David
CPSO#:
78635
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jul 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jul 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 1999
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Emergency Medicine
Hamilton Health Sciences Corp
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 46368
Electoral District: 04
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Douglas Martin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 30 2021
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Manitoba
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Emergency Medicine |
Effective:16 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. DOUGLAS DAVID MARTIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARTIN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 11 Feb 2004 to 09 Mar 2004
EL - Emergency Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Nov 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Dec 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Jan 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 11 Feb 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Mar 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jul 2004 |