THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/04/24 11:18:45 AM
Liem, Joel Jonathan San Bing
CPSO#:
78631
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Mar 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Mar 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Ottawa, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Allergy Asthma Associates
1407 Ottawa Street
Windsor ON N8X 2G1
Phone: (519) 258-4356
Fax: (519) 258-9918
Electoral District: 01
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Windsor Regional Hospital |
Windsor |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:30 Jun 2004 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Clinical Immunology and Allergy |
Effective:17 Sep 2005 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. JOEL JONATHAN SAN BING LIEM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIEM is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 22 Oct 2002 to 15 Nov 2002
EL - Pediatrics
University of Toronto, 05 May 2003 to 01 Jun 2003
EL - Paediatric Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 20 Sep 2004 to 15 Oct 2004
EL - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy
University of Toronto, 16 Oct 2004 to 19 Nov 2004
EL - Clinical Immunology and Allergy
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 15 Nov 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 May 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 19 Nov 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 2006 |