THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 19:44:39 PM
Gupta, Rohit
CPSO#:
78613
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
16 Jan 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
16 Jan 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Punjabi University, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare
South Muskoka Memorial Hospital
Department of Surgery
75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON P1L 2E4
Phone: (705) 645-7749
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare |
Bracebridge |
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital |
Huntsville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:02 Nov 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ROHIT GUPTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUPTA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Oct 2006
CF - General Surgery
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Apr 2007 to 20 Oct 2007
International Specialist Physician - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 27 Oct 2005 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Oct 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jan 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2013 |