THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
04/05/24 10:09:14 AM
Fadavi, Ziba
CPSO#:
78599
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Farsi
Education: AHWAZ UNIVERSITY OF MEDICAL SCIENCES, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarbrough and Rouge hospital
Birchmount Capmus
Scarborough ON M1W 3W3
Phone: (416) 284-8131 Ext. 4891
Fax: (416) 281-7486
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount |
Toronto |
West Parry Sound Health Centre |
Parry Sound |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:01 Jan 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ZIBA FADAVI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FADAVI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Oct 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
International Specialist Physician - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Apr 2003 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Mar 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
McMaster University, 01 Apr 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Nov 2004 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Dec 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Jan 2006 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Feb 2007 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 21 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |