THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 9:58:11 AM
Jani, Prashant Anantrai
CPSO#:
78594
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Feb 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Feb 2015
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Marathi
Education: University of Pune, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
Department of Pathology
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6591
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:01 Jan 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. PRASHANT ANANTRAI JANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JANI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2002 to 31 Mar 2003
International Specialist Physician - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 May 2003 to 30 Apr 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 May 2004 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Oct 2002 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2005 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Apr 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Feb 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Aug 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 13 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 11 Nov 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Academic Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Nov 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Feb 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 2015 |